This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:55 (UTC).

GDN NICHOLAS SALVUCCI

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 GDN NICHOLAS SALVUCCI was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seidman, David, Knight, Alisa R., Bittleston, Dawn and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2303

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seidman, David

Knight, Alisa R.

Bittleston, Dawn

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDWARDS, KELLY ESTELLA

 

Court Documents

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Per Declaration, minor was left "with his aunt". What is aunt's name and need proof of service to same.; Parties Present Petitioner: EDWARDS, KELLY ESTELLA

Ex Parte Hearing

04/17/17 MO: EX PARTE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR TEMPORARY APPOINTMENT SAME NOTES - 1. Need proof of personal service to father, Peter Salvucci. 2. Need proof of personal service to mother, Jaime Perez. 3. Per Declaration, minor was left "with his aunt". What is aunt's name and need proof of service to same.; Parties Present Petitioner: EDWARDS, KELLY ESTELLA

Ex Parte Hearing

04/11/17 MO: Ex Parte Hearing: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - for Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian NOTES - 1. Need proof of personal service to father, Peter Salvucci. 2. Need proof of personal service to mother, Jaime Perez. 3. Per Declaration, minor was left "with his aunt". What is aunt's name and need proof of service to same.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration and application for ex parte hearing; petition for appointment of temporary guardian; petition for appointment of guardian...Returned to Kelly Edwards via pro per bin "E"

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketStatus Report in re: PC 1513.2 - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: Contact Probate Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketConfidential Guardianship Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketStatus Report in re: PC 1513.2 - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Reset; Comment: Contact Probate Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Compliance to Probate Code 1513.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketConfidential Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Compliance to Probate Code 1513.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketLetters of Guardianship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Per Declaration, minor was left "with his aunt". What is aunt's name and need proof of service to same.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 05/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - 04/11/17 MO: Ex Parte Hearing: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - for Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian NOTES - 1. Need proof of personal service to father, Peter Salvucci. 2. Need proof of personal service to mother, Jaime Perez. 3. Per Declaration, minor was left "with his aunt". What is aunt's name and need proof of service to same.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Comment: Hearing date: 5/23/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 a.m. Hearing Division: P Commissioner: Alisa R. Knight

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Comment: General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Comment: Temporary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketParental Notification of Indian Status (ICWA-020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Guardian: Kelly Estella Edwards Person/Estate: Person Hearing date: 5/23/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 am in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian - Comment: Hearing Date: 4/11/2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 a.m. Division: P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration and application for ex parte hearing; petition for appointment of temporary guardian; petition for appointment of guardian...Returned to Kelly Edwards via pro per bin "E"

    Read MoreRead Less