This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 09:54:23 (UTC).

GDN MILES SCOTT MANDA

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 GDN MILES SCOTT MANDA was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division Justice Building located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2874

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARK, CATHERINE K

Not Classified By Court

FAMILY COURT SERVICES

KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEAD CALVIN R

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

02/04/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

03/03/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

10/12/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Review; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Compliance Hearing; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Rider with Bond; Comment: Bonding Company: Amount: $Principal: $Special/Temp/General: Commissioner:; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: Order Approving Petition to Increase Bond of Catherine K. Park; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Review; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Compliance Hearing; Dept.: Bakersfield JJC Department J1; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Order Approving Petition to Increase Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Supplement; Comment: Supplement to Verified Petition to Increase Bond of Catherine K. Park; Approval by the Administrator of the Scott Kenneth Manda Estate; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Dept.: Bakersfield Division P; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Audio streaming announced.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Family Court Services Investigator's Report; Comment: HRG DATE 10/15/2021; Filed By: AGENCY - FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Notice to Kern County Family Court Services of Probate Code

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Order Prescribing Notice; Comment: Hearing date: 10/15/2021Hearing time: 8:30amHearing Division/Department: p; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFile Type: UCCJEA; Comment: Declaration Under UCCJEA; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Duties of Guardian; Comment: Duties of Guardian; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Screening Form; Comment: Confidential Screening Form; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Petition for Appointment of Guardian-Estate Only; Comment: Petition for Appointment of GuardianProposed guardian: Catherine K. ParkPerson/Estate: Estate onlyHearing date: 10/15/2021Hearing time: @8:30am in Divison P; Filed By: PETITIONER - PARK, CATHERINE K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less