This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:32 (UTC).

GDN KE'NORI JA SHAUN JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 GDN KE'NORI JA SHAUN JOHNSON was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seidman, David, Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2311

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seidman, David

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REDD, PATRICIA ANN

 

Court Documents

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 07/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. Need service to minor's siblings or dispense with notice.

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 05/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need service to minor's siblings or dispense with notice.; Parties Present Petitioner: REDD, PATRICIA ANN

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian 07/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. Need service to minor's siblings or dispense with notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian 05/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need service to minor's siblings or dispense with notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 05/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketDepartment of Human Services Letter Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Comment: Hearing date: 5/15/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 a.m. Hearing Division: P Commissioner: Alisa R. Knight

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Seidman, David; Comment: General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: as to Patricia Ann Redd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketParental Notification of Indian Status (ICWA-020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Guardian: Patricia Ann Redd Person/Estate: Person Hearing date: 5/15/2017 Hearing time: 9:00 am in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: as to Patricia Ann Redd

    Read MoreRead Less