This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:18:54 (UTC).

GDN JALAL MINORS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 GDN JALAL MINORS was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stein, Cameryn and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2000

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stein, Cameryn

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCCORMACK, KENYA

Not Classified By Court

DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

 

Court Documents

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Original Type: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Petition for Appointment of Guardian 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 01/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Fees... AMS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketStatus Report in re: PC 1513.2 - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: Contact Probate Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketLetters of Guardianship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Declaration for investigative fees and order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Original Type: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Petition for Appointment of Guardian 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver - Comment: Father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver - Comment: Mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Human Services Letter Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketReport of Human Services

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Stein, Cameryn; Comment: Hearing date: 2/18/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Division/Department: P Judicial Officer: Andrew Kendall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Stein, Cameryn; Comment: general

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Stein, Cameryn; Comment: temporary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Proposed guardian: Kenya McCormack Person/Estate: Person only Hearing date: 2/18/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian - Comment: Hearing date: 1/21/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. Division P

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.