This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 03:30:25 (UTC).

GDN CHANDLER KANE ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 GDN CHANDLER KANE ANDERSON was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2284

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ZUBIA, MATTHEW DAVID

ZUBIA, LETICIA BERTHA

Not Classified By Court

DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letters of guardianship returned to Matthew & Leticia Zubia c/o Rescue Me Legal Docs. via mail

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 05/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of service to father, Matthew Robert Anderson Jr. 2. Need proof of service to mother, Serina Samantha Armas. 3. Need proof of mailing. 4. Need Department of Human Services Probate Code 1513(a) Report. 5. Number 6a, 6b, and 6c on the petition for appointment of guardian are incomplete. Need completion via verified supplement. 6. Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UUCJEA) under relationship petitioners indicated they are the current guardians which is inconsistent with petition filed. Need Amended UCCJEA with correct relationship to minor.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: notice of hearing.....returned via mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Comment: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letters of guardianship returned to Matthew & Leticia Zubia c/o Rescue Me Legal Docs. via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Code 1513(a) or 1513(b) investigation by Department of Human Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: verified supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 5/26/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Declaration for investigative fees and order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian 05/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of service to father, Matthew Robert Anderson Jr. 2. Need proof of service to mother, Serina Samantha Armas. 3. Need proof of mailing. 4. Need Department of Human Services Probate Code 1513(a) Report. 5. Number 6a, 6b, and 6c on the petition for appointment of guardian are incomplete. Need completion via verified supplement. 6. Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UUCJEA) under relationship petitioners indicated they are the current guardians which is inconsistent with petition filed. Need Amended UCCJEA with correct relationship to minor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketReport of Human Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Human Services Letter Received

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice to the Department of Human Services of Probate Code

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Hearing date: 5/26/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Division/Department: P Judicial Officer: Andrew Kendall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: general

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketParental Notification of Indian Status (ICWA-020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketParental Notification of Indian Status (ICWA-020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Proposed guardian: Matthew David Zubia and Leticia Bertha Zubia Person/Estate: Person only Hearing date: 5/26/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.