This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 07:20:09 (UTC).

GDN BLACK AND CANO MINORS

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 GDN BLACK AND CANO MINORS was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2008

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BLACK, TROY W

BLACK, RHONDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GRADOWITZ, KENT M.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 02/25/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need proof of service to minor/Aaliyah's father, Richard Ray Escobedo.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: petition for appointment of guardian...returned to GBLA via AMS bin

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: petition for appointment of guardian of the person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 8/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian 02/25/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need proof of service to minor/Aaliyah's father, Richard Ray Escobedo.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFamily Court Services Investigator's Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Human Services Letter Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 2/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice to Kern County Family Court Services of Probate Code

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Hearing date: 2/25/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Division/Department: P Judicial Officer: Andrew Kendall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: general

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver - Comment: minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver - Comment: father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketConsent Nomination and Waiver - Comment: mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Proposed guardian: Troy Black & Rhonda Black Person/Estate: Person only Hearing date: 2/25/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: petition for appointment of guardian...returned to GBLA via AMS bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: as to Troy W. Black & Rhonda Black (minor, Jordynn Aniya Marie Cano)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: as to Troy W. Black & Rhonda Black (minor, Aaliyah Nicole Black)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: as to Troy W. Black & Rhonda Black (minor, Jordynn Aniya Marie Cano)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: as to Troy W. Black & Rhonda Black (minor, Aaliyah Nicole Black)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.