This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 07:21:37 (UTC).

GDN ALEXYS ROSE PADILLA

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 GDN ALEXYS ROSE PADILLA was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2010

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PENA, JOSE R

PENA, EUGENIA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTERS PRO PER BIN

Petition for Appointment of Guardian

Petition for Appointment of Guardian 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need FCS Report. 2. Need ICWA-020 form completed and filed by co-petitioner, Eugenia Pena. 3. Need proof of service to father, Jose M. Pena. 4. Need proof of service to mother, Rae Lynn Padilla.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketStatus Report in re: PC 1513.2 - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: Contact Probate Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketLetters of Guardianship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTERS PRO PER BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need FCS Report. 2. Need ICWA-020 form completed and filed by co-petitioner, Eugenia Pena. 3. Need proof of service to father, Jose M. Pena. 4. Need proof of service to mother, Rae Lynn Padilla.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFamily Court Services Investigator's Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Human Services Letter Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice to Kern County Family Court Services of Probate Code

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Hearing date: 2/18/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Division/Department: P Judicial Officer: Andrew Kendall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: general

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: as to Jose R. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketParental Notification of Indian Status (ICWA-020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian - Comment: Proposed guardian: Jose R. Pena & Eugenia Pena Person/Estate: Person only Hearing date: 2/18/2020 Hearing time: 8:30 a.m. in Division P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: as to Jose R. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less