This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 15:21:45 (UTC).

GCC PARTNERS, LLC VS JONES

Case Summary

On 02/20/2014 GCC PARTNERS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Zulfa, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2218

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Zulfa, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCC PARTNERS, LLC

Defendant

JONES, TAMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $17.00 for JONES, TAMMY (DE-1). Received from CELIDA MIRAMONTES. Receipt #796502 for amount of $17.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CASE DISMISSED ~ calid=2485255 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4003, CourtDate:05/22/2014, Courtroom:BM, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:BKS, SystemDate:2/22/2014 8:12:59 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketNP1475 - Comment: Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT FILED 3/3/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LESLIE BORN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ON BEHALF OF . CELIDA B MIRAMONTES APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT TAMMY JONES (DE-1). GCC PARTNERS, LLC (PL-1) MOTION FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Docket4054 Demurrer - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketDemurrer - Original Type: Demurrer; Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for GCC PARTNERS, LLC (PL-1). Received from GCC PARTNERS, check no(s) 39586264. Receipt #766309 for amount of $7.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: M1502CL22218_140303_144052 eFax document: FAX-17848.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for GCC PARTNERS, LLC (PL-1). Received from FAST EVICTION SERVICE, check no(s) 041824. Receipt #764366 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2014
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 5/22/2014 at 1:30PM in Department BM, 1773 HIGHWAY 58, MOJAVE, CA 93501, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES OF COURT 3.17.1(C) WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 5/22/2014 at 1:30PM in Department BM, 1773 HIGHWAY 58, MOJAVE, CA 93501, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES OF COURT 3.17.1(C) WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ BRYAN K STAINFIELD Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE