This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:12 (UTC).

GAZALI VS RAQUEL EVONNE JIMENEZ / JB AUTOMOTIVE CENTER

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 GAZALI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAQUEL EVONNE JIMENEZ / JB AUTOMOTIVE CENTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1599

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAZALI, ALI

Defendant

RAQUEL EVONNE JIMENEZ / JB AUTOMOTIVE CENTER

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Req for Dism After Hearing/Trial (CS/FAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GAZALI, ALI; Served: 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER *G

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.