This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 06:39:06 (UTC).

GAYOU VS GIBSON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 GAYOU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GIBSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAYOU, DEBORAH L.

Defendants

JOHNSTON, CHRIS M., II

JOHNSTON, CHERYL L.

FISHER, JOSHUA

GIBSON, ROSE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 08/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: GAYOU, DEBORAH L.; Defendant: FISHER, JOSHUA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letter

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR CHRIS M. JOHNSON-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) *** 2nd CORRECTED ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR CHRIS M. JOHNSTON, II-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR CHERYL JOHNSTON-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT- JOSHUA FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR CHRIS M JOHNSTON-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of entry of judgment for Cheryl L. Johnston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: notice of entry of judgment for Rose Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: FOR CHRIS M. II JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: for Cheryl L. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: FOR JOSHUA FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: for Rose Gibson. RECEIPT SIGN BY MISTAKE BY THE CTSI CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: FOR CHRIS M. II JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: FOR CHERYL L. JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: FOR ROSE GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: FOR JOSHUA FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GAYOU, DEBORAH L.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less