This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:17:07 (UTC).

GAY VS KERN COUNTY LIBRARY

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 GAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KERN COUNTY LIBRARY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAY, LOREN

Defendant

KERN COUNTY LIBRARY

 

Court Documents

Ruling

MO-Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Small Claims Trial

MO-trial: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: GAY, LOREN

Small Claims Trial

MO-Trial: Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial; Parties Present Plaintiff: GAY, LOREN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: KERN COUNTY LIBRARY; No Judgment Awarded; Awarded Against: GAY, LOREN; Party: Names: GAY, LOREN; KERN COUNTY LIBRARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - MO-Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Tom Newell authorized to appear for Kern County Library

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Charissa Wagner authorized to appear for Kern County Library

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - MO-trial: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - MO-Trial: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Kern County Library Charissa Wagner- Manager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GAY, LOREN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.