This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 02:42:38 (UTC).

GAY VS GAY

Case Summary

On 06/04/2015 GAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G., Woodward, Cory J. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8485

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Woodward, Cory J.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GAY, LOREN

Respondent

GAY, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON, LESLIE

Respondent Attorney

SILVA, WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 08/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 11/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Respondent

MO-CONT RESP RFO FILED 2/26/16 AND REVIEW OF RESP RFO FILED ON 10/13/15: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: GAY, LOREN; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Review

MO-REVIEW FROM RESP RFO FILED ON 10/13/15: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Respondent

MO-RESP RFO FILED ON 2/26/16: Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: GAY, LOREN; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO-Pet RFO: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: GAY, LOREN; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO-confirmation: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Petitioner: GAY, LOREN; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 01/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 09/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 05/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Ruling

Ruling DPG 12/1/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 09/30/2016: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

Review

6/29/16 REVIEW/STATUS OF TENTATIVE AGREEMENT FROM CONT RESP RFO FILED 10/13/15: Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Respondent

MO - Cont Resp. RFO Re: other relief filed 2-26-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held

Request for Order - Respondent

MO - Cont Resp. RFO RE: Other relief filed 2-26-16, status of 730 eval: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: GAY, LOREN; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

Request for Order - Respondent

MO-CONT RESP RFO FILED ON 2/26/16 AND CONT RESP RFO FILED ON 10/13/15: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: GAY, LOREN; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE; Respondent: GAY, MICHAEL; Attorney: SILVA, WAYNE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: GAY, LOREN; GAY, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 5/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Respondent's Response to Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - MO-Pet RFO: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Respondent's Responsive Declaration to Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Summons Served 6/8/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: Petitioner's Re: CS/ SS/ OO/ Attorney Fees and Costs Filed 6/4/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.