This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 01:59:20 (UTC).

GARZA V. FLORES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2013 GARZA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORES,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9445

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARZA, ALMA

Defendant

FLORES, JUANITA B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketLaw and Motion - Comment: Department: BD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: LAW AND MOTION: MOTION TO VACATE HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. JUANITA B FLORES (DE-1) MOTION FOR VACATE IS DENIED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1:42PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Docket4118 Motion to Vacate - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketMotion to Vacate - Original Type: Motion to Vacate; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketMotion to Vacate - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Docket859A Pmt: Small Claims Motion to Vacate CCP 116.745 (1/1/06) - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for FLORES, JUANITA B (DE-1). Received from FLORES. Receipt #756283 for amount of $20.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ALMA GARZA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY JUANITIA B. FLORES(DE-1) MARTIN AGUIRRE PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR ALMA GARZA(PL-1). PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JUDGMENT FOR ALMA GARZA(PL-1) AGAINST JUANITA B. FLORES(DE-1) FOR PRINCIPAL $8121.48 DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1:54PM. JUDGMENT FOR AGAINST FOR PRINCIPAL $ COSTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CONTINUED COURT TRIAL FROM 10/23/13 REASON FOR CONTINUANCE: NO POS ON BERNADETTE ALANIZ (DE-2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: CONTINUED COURT TRIAL FROM 10/23/13 REASON FOR CONTINUANCE: NO POS ON BERNADETTE ALANIZ (DE-2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: CLAIM: $10000.00 COSTS: $154.00 ($75.00 FILING FEE + $30.00 + 49.00 CERTIFIED MAIL FEES) DEFT SERVED BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/07/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • Docket853F Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $5,000 but not - Comment: Amount of $75.00 for GARZA, ALMA (PL-1). Received from CUSTOMER. Receipt #736012 for amount of $105.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • Docket855B Pmt: Service by Certified Mail (to Each Defendant) - Comment: Amount of $30.00 for GARZA, ALMA (PL-1). Received from CUSTOMER. Receipt #736012 for amount of $105.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 213

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less