This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 20:21:00 (UTC).

GARZA, III VS MR. CIGAR

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 GARZA, III filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MR CIGAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1515

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Cross Plaintiff

MR CIGAR DBA LUXOR CAFE VAPE LOUNGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

PERFECTION PEN, LLC DBA VAPE 94

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ECHEVERRIA RICARDO

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

04/03/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Ruling

03/06/2019: Ruling

Ruling

03/06/2019: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

03/05/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Mail Returned Undelivered

04/16/2019: Mail Returned Undelivered

Order Dismissing Action (Full)

04/08/2019: Order Dismissing Action (Full)

Judgment by Default by Court

03/29/2019: Judgment by Default by Court

Notice of Order to Appear

03/07/2019: Notice of Order to Appear

Notice of Order to Appear

03/07/2019: Notice of Order to Appear

Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt

12/18/2015: Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

12/16/2015: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Rejection/Correction Notice

01/07/2016: Rejection/Correction Notice

Certificate of Inability to Respond

12/29/2015: Certificate of Inability to Respond

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

12/18/2015: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

11/23/2015: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

11/23/2015: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/19/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

11/19/2015: Complaint

272 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Mail Returned Undelivered; Comment: Order dismissing action returned. No forwarding address provided.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order Dismissing Action (Full); Comment: Without Prejudice as to Cross Complaint of Vape Fame AND Perfection Pen LLC.; Filed By: CROSS COMPLAINANT - MR CIGAR DBA LUXOR CAFE VAPE LOUNGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION|CROSS DEFENDANT - PERFECTION PEN, LLC DBA VAPE 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 10; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: as to Cross-Defendant Perfection Pen LLC on Cross-Complaint of Mr. Cigar d/b/a Luxor Cafe Vape Lounge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Appear; Comment: and Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Vape Fames' Cross-Complaint. Hrg:4/3/19 @ 8:30 am in Dept.10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Appear; Comment: and Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Perfection Pen LLC's Cross-Complaint. Hrg: 4/3/19 @ 8:30 am in Dept.10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 10; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Court Judgment; Comment: as to Cross-Defendant Perfection Pen, LLC on Cross Complaint filed 2/18/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
246 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: Motion -- Returned via Efile -- No reservation and no fees included.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Inability to Respond; Comment: request for 30 extension to respond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt; Comment: as to Mr. Cigar d/b/a Luxor Cafe Vape Lounge, a California corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: As to Vape Fame, sub served 12/5/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: As to Flawless Vapes, LLC only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 3/04/16Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less