This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 21:17:45 (UTC).

GARZA & GARZA VS INIGUEZ & CRUZ

Case Summary

On 04/22/2011 GARZA GARZA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INIGUEZ CRUZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3082

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARZA, MARBELIN

GARZA, AMADEO

Defendants

INIGUEZ, JULIA

CRUZ, ARELLANO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2012
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $0.50 for GARZA, MARBELIN (PL-1). Received from MARBLIN GARZA. Receipt #677364 for amount of $0.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARBELIN GARZA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. AMADEO GARZA (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JULIA INIGUEZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ARELLANO CRUZ (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MARBELIN GARZA PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. AMADEO GARZA DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JULIA INIGUEZ DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. ARELLANO CRUZ THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT: JORGE INIGUEZ DANIEL BERRY PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR DEFENDANT ARELLANO CRUZ. CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGEMENT FOR PLAINTIFF FOR $4400.00 PLUS COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: MARBELIN GARZA, AMADEO GARZA & JULIA INIGUEZ APPEARED AT COUNTER PER JUDGE ALISA KNIGHT CASE CONTINUED FROM 07/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: MARBELIN GARZA, AMADEO GARZA & JULIA INIGUEZ APPEARED AT COUNTER PER JUDGE ALISA KNIGHT CASE CONTINUED FROM 07/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: CONTINUED FROM 7/14/2011 MARBELIN GARZA, AMADEO GARZA & JULIA INIGUEZ APPEARED CONTINUED FROM 7/14/2011 MARBELIN GARZA, AMADEO GARZA & JULIA INIGUEZ APPEARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SC-100 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT WHO SERVED: ARELLANO CRUZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 07/28/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketNP1820 - Comment: Department: NONE Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. SET ASIDE ORDER TO DISMISS. ALL PARTIES WERE SITTING IN DIVISION A. CASE REFERRED TO CIVIL CLERK TO SET NEW COURT DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF MARBELIN GARZA AND AMADEO GARZA NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENANTS JULIA INGUEZ AND ARELLANO CRUZ CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DUPLICATE CALENDAR ~ calid=1605863 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:07/14/2011, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:SCT, Judge:GRW, Deputy:CYNTHIAG, SystemDate:6/2/2011 2:42:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT SENT BY CERTIFIED MAILED TO ARELLANO CRUZ RETURNED FROM POSTAL OFFICE MARKED UNDELIVERABLE 06/30/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. MARBELIN GARZA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. AMADEO GARZA (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JULIA INIGUEZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY ARELLANO CRUZ PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. MARBELIN GARZA AND AMADEO GARZA DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JULIA INIGUEZ THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: ARELLANO CRUZ WAS NOT SERVED. PLAINTIFF TO SERVE ARELLANO CRUZ CAUSE CONTINUED TO JULY 14,2011 AT 1:30 P.M. FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: 7006 3450 0000 4764 3876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • Docket855A Pmt: Service by Certified Mail (Per Party) CCP 116.232 - Comment: Amount of $10.00 for GARZA, AMADEO (PL-2). Received from AMADEO GARZA. Receipt #594397 for amount of $10.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • Docket853F Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $5,000 but not - Comment: Amount of $75.00 for GARZA, MARBELIN (PL-1). Received from MARBELIN GARZA. Receipt #585858 for amount of $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less