This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:46:45 (UTC).

GARNER VS GARNER

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 GARNER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARNER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4612

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARNER, TINA

Respondent

GARNER, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: GARNER, TINA

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2016
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Arrangement - TOTAL FEES DUE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: GARNER, TINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: HRG 11/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less