This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:08:30 (UTC).

GARDNER PROPERTY MANAGMENT VS MCGEE

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 GARDNER PROPERTY MANAGMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCGEE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0239

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDNER PROPERTY MANAGMENT

Defendant

MCGEE, EDDIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GARDNER PROPERTY MANAGMENT; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 16049 L ST #E MOJAVE CA 93501; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: MCGEE, EDDIE; Party: Names: GARDNER PROPERTY MANAGMENT; MCGEE, EDDIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA PICK UP FOR MICHELE SLADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE, & WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Judgment , Application and Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR WRIT & WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AGAINST EDDIE MCGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR EDDIE MCGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT PACKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GARDNER PROPERTY MANAGMENT; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NEW UD FILING

    Read MoreRead Less