Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:01:37 (UTC).

GARDEA VS GARDEA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 GARDEA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARDEA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven, Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1664

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARDEA, LINDA

Respondent

GARDEA, AUGUSTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMS, RONALD S

Respondent Attorney

LEON, DAVID F

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

07/28/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 05/19/16; Parties Present Petitioner: GARDEA, LINDA; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S; Respondent: GARDEA, AUGUSTINE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS(JOINDER)/ REQUEST FOR JOINDER/ PLEADING ON JOINDER

Request for Order - Respondent

RESP S/S, ATTY F/C: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES S/S ATTY F/C; Parties Present Petitioner: GARDEA, LINDA; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S; Respondent: GARDEA, AUGUSTINE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT FROM 2/16/17; Parties Present Petitioner: GARDEA, LINDA; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S; Respondent: GARDEA, AUGUSTINE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: DAVID F. LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIRMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Notice of Appearance and Response of Employee Pension Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Summons (Joinder) Returned and Filed - Comment: CLAIMANT: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: CONT'D FROM 3/23/17 AND 5/18/17 7/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Request for Joinder - Comment: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Pleading on Joinder-Employee Pension Benefit Plan - Comment: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Summons (Joinder) Returned and Filed - Comment: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS(JOINDER)/ REQUEST FOR JOINDER/ PLEADING ON JOINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - RESP S/S, ATTY F/C: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES S/S ATTY F/C; Parties Present Petitioner: GARDEA, LINDA; Respondent: GARDEA, AUGUSTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Responsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 10/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 10/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES S/S ATTY F/C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less