This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 11:41:32 (UTC).

GARCREST ENGINEERING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS CSW CONTRACTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 GARCREST ENGINEERING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CSW CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2473

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCREST ENGINEERING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

U.S. BORAX, INC./RIO TINTO MINERALS

CSW CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

U.S. BORAX, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RIO TINTO SERVICES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

WERNER, DAVID D.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order 02/28/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Michael Harris Re: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Reason: Proof of Service is required, please submit concurrently with form POS-010.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Michael Harris Re: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Reason: Proof of Service is required, please submit concurrently with form POS-010.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of OSC re 3.110 (N20): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/15/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: why matter should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of OSC re 3.110 (N20): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: CONT 01/15/19 STATUS OF POS AST DEFT CSW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 02/28/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of OSC re 3.110 (N20): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Michael Harris Re: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Reason: Proof of Service is required, please submit concurrently with form POS-010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Michael Harris Re: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Reason: Proof of Service is required, please submit concurrently with form POS-010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of OSC re 3.110 (N20): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/15/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSW CONTRACTORS, INC., AN ARIZONA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RIO TINTO SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. BORAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERNER DAVID D.