This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 04:01:22 (UTC).

GARCIA VS RODRIGUEZ, M.D.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2014 GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, M D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2528

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, LUIS ANDRES

RAMOS, ADELFA D.

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, M.D., ROLAND

AYAD, M.D., AMIRA

BAKERSFIELD FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOGEL, BENJAMIN

Attorney at 16933 PARTHENIA S

Suite 110

Northridge, CA 91343

Defendant Attorney

THELEN, DENNIS R

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

Minute Order - 2 Motions to Compel - 10/22/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 9/22/15 Defendant, ROLAND RODRIGUEZ, M.D. Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Luis Andres Garcia's and Adelfa D Ramos' Answers to Supplemental Interrogatory and to Special Interrogatories, Set No. Two ******************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO COMPEL. PROPOSED FORMAL ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE OF FORMAL ORDER ON ISSUANCE. TIME FORM RESPONSES RUNS FROM SERVICE OF NOTICE OF FORMAL ORDER. ***********************************************

Mandatory Settlement Conference

10/9/15 Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS (D-4)FCMC 10/30/2015 TD 11/09/2015; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: THELEN, DENNIS R

Motion for Summary Judgment

Minute Order - MSJ -09/28/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/10/15 Defendants, BAKERSFIELD FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER & AMIRA AYAD, M.D. Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants ******************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. MOTION IS UNOPPOSED. THERE IS NO OPPOSING SEPARTATE STATEMENT. CCP SECTION 437c(b)(3). MOTION IS SUPPORTED ON THE MERITS BASED ON DEFENDANTS' UNDISPUTED FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF FACTS. ****************************************************

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SIGNATURE MISSING ON PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Docket4000 Jury Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: T/E 8 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Docket4142 Final Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: T/E 8 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES.JURY TRIAL 11/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS; JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES.JURY TRIAL 11/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Filed by Tara K. Haner, Esq (Motions in Limine; Proposed Statement of the Case; Prospective Witness List; Prospective Exhibit List; Proposed Jury Instructions; Trial Brief Re: Issues of Proof; Trial Brief Re: MICRA Issues; Trial Brief Re: Causation Issues; Trial Brief Re Admissibility of Medical Records; Notice of Defendant's Request for Judgment Ordering Periodic Payment of Future Damages and For Limitation of Award for Non-Economic Damages; and Defendant's Request for Presence of an Official Court Reporter at Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2014
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: (DEFENDANT ROLAND RODRIGUEZ) FILED BY DENNIS R. THELEN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • DocketDeposit of Jury Fees - Comment: FILED BY DENNIS R. THELEN, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO AMIRA AYAD M.D. BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ROLAND RODRIGUEZ MD SERVED BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for GARCIA, LUIS ANDRES (PL-1). Received from ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSING, check no(s) 414707. Receipt #789842 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 04, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 04, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY BENJAMIN FOGEL, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY BENJAMIN FOGEL, ESQ. CMC SET 1/23/15 @8:00AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THELEN, DENNIS R