Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 12:57:05 (UTC).

GARCIA VS GONZALES, III (B)

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 GARCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GONZALES, III B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Loo, Cynthia L., Cannon, Gloria, Oglesby, John D. and Diesman, Kathleen O.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1330

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Loo, Cynthia L.

Cannon, Gloria

Oglesby, John D.

Diesman, Kathleen O.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA, MARIA ANGELICA

Respondent

GONZALES, ADOLPH A, III

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

PARTY, MINOR

MINOR'S, COUNSEL

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P

Respondent Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

SCHRODER, REX A

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 04/02/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS CONT FROM 8/14/19, 11/18/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS CONT FROM 8/14/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Motion

Motion 01/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Oglesby, John D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/6/18 NOM TO BE RELIEVED; Parties Present Petitioner; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 9/4/18 RES MOD C/C C/V 3 MINORS **SUBPOENAED RECORDS SENT W/FILE**; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MARIA ANGELICA; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent: GONZALES, ADOLPH A, III

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 2/02/18 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/03/18, 5/31/18, 6/04/18, 6/07/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 09/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MARIA ANGELICA; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent: GONZALES, ADOLPH A, III; Attorney: SCHRODER, REX A; Minor Party: MINOR'S, COUNSEL; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/02/18 PET C/C C/V - 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 5/3/18 5/23/18 5/31/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/02/18 PET C/C C/V - 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 5/3/18 5/23/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/02/18 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 5/3/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MARIA ANGELICA; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent: GONZALES, ADOLPH A, III; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/02/18 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 4/6/18 *(M) FTA MED 3/27* **SEND TO MED**; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MARIA ANGELICA; Privately Retained: AZEMIKA, NICHOLAS P; Respondent: GONZALES, ADOLPH A, III; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/02/18 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS **PET 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 03/13/18**; Parties Present Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 02/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MARIA ANGELICA; Respondent: GONZALES, ADOLPH A, III

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS CONT FROM 8/14/19, 11/18/19 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/02/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS CONT FROM 8/14/19, 11/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS CONT FROM 8/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/08/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG 8/14/19 DIV. B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Motion 01/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Oglesby, John D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/6/18 NOM TO BE RELIEVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: NOM TO BE RELIEVED Hearing Date: 1/7/19 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Counsel for a Child Regarding Qualifications

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: EX PARTE DENIED OTHER ORDERS MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 02/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 2/2/18 Hearing Time: 11:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant

Latest cases where MINOR'S COUNSEL is a litigant