Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 06:11:52 (UTC).

GARCIA VS GARCIA (E)

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 GARCIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GARCIA E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Bittleston, Dawn and Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3400

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA

Petitioner

GARCIA, MICAELA

Defendant

GARCIA (E)

Respondent

GARCIA, RUBEN

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 02/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/24/19 PET C/S 2 MINORS **DVRO GRANTED ON 1/13/20** **ORIGINALLY SET IN DIVISION E**

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 01/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/24/19 PET DV/TRO C/S MOVE OUT VISITATION EXCHANGE 2 MINORS

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 01/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 12/31/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S CARE OF ANIMALS MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL DEBT PYMT PYMT COST/SRVCS 2 MINORS NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MICAELA; Respondent: GARCIA, RUBEN; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR'S; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 12/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/6/18 10/29/18, 11/26/18 12/17/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MICAELA; Respondent: GARCIA, RUBEN; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/6/18 10/29/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MICAELA; Respondent: GARCIA, RUBEN; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/6/18 10/29/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MICAELA; Respondent: GARCIA, RUBEN; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/6/18; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MICAELA; Respondent: GARCIA, RUBEN; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 08/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/2018 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, MICAELA; Respondent: GARCIA, RUBEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: FILED BY DCSS - HRG 2/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketState Guideline Calculation (DCSS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Comment: RE: C/S **DVRO GRANTED ON 1/13/20** **TO BE HEARD IN DIV.A**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/24/19 PET C/S 2 MINORS **DVRO GRANTED ON 1/13/20** **ORIGINALLY SET IN DIVISION E**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Comment: EXP 01/13/2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/24/19 PET DV/TRO C/S MOVE OUT VISITATION EXCHANGE 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 1/13/2020 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/6/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Counsel for a Child Regarding Qualifications

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STEPHANIE CHILDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/24/2018 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S MOVE OUT CARE OF ANIMALS PROP CNTRL DEBT PMNT PMNT COSTS/SVCS 2 MINORS NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 8/6/2018 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant

Latest cases where Garcia is a litigant