This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:06:30 (UTC).

GARCIA VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 GARCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0097

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA, ENEDINA

Respondent

GARCIA, ALFREDO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: GARCIA, ENEDINA; GARCIA, ALFREDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: GARCIA, ENEDINA; Served: 05/15/20177:39 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less