This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:23:51 (UTC).

GARCIA VS. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 GARCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2136

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA, ALBERT

Respondents

GARCIA, STACY

GARCIA, STACEY

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - DCSS Respondent (Modification)

12/12/2016 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - DCSS RESPONDENT (MODIFICATION) RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND SET ASIDE DE: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES MOD C/S SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMEMNT 2 MINORS

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 09/19/2016: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: HRG 12/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - DCSS Respondent (Modification) - 12/12/2016 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - DCSS RESPONDENT (MODIFICATION) RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND SET ASIDE DE: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES MOD C/S SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMEMNT 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 12/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: RES MOD C/S SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMEMNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: GARCIA, ALBERT; GARCIA, STACEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketDCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: HRG 9/19/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for GARCIA, ALBERT (PE-1). Received from ALBERT GARCIA. Receipt #835454 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.