This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:17:49 (UTC).

GARCIA, Jr. VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2015 GARCIA, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0075

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA, FILIMON, Jr.

Respondent

GARCIA, BELEN

 

Court Documents

Default

02/05/16 MO: Default Hearing: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCIA, FILIMON, Jr.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 03/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: GARCIA, FILIMON, Jr.; GARCIA, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - 02/05/16 MO: Default Hearing: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: DEFAULT HEARING COURT DATE: 02/05/16 TIME: 9:00 AM DIV:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Served: 09/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.