This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:31:12 (UTC).

GARCIA ET AL VS WHITTAKER

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WHITTAKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0790

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, ADELA

GARCIA, MARISON

Defendants

WHITTAKER, ANGELA

WHITTAKER, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOOSAPOOR, SEB

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of any unserved parties pursuant to CRC rule 3.110b (cont'd from 07/27/17); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MOOSAPOOR, SEB; Plaintiff; Attorney: MOOSAPOOR, SEB

Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet

Minute Order Dated 9-11-17:

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-11-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 8-25-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons does not conform to the Complaint. The word "Inclusive" is not on the original complaint. Please contact Clerk's office with questions.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons rejected in File & Serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons does not conform to the complaint. "Inclusive" is not on the complaint. Plaintiff's name "Adela" does not match the complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 3rd Rejection. Summons does not conform to the Complaint. Angela Whittaker is not named as a Defendant on the Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Plaintiff's name on Summons does not conform to Plaintiff's name on the complaint

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: (Counsel reported at last hearing the parties were served and case was settling) OSC RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 07/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of any unserved parties pursuant to CRC rule 3.110b (cont'd from 07/27/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Minute Order Dated 9-11-17:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order Dated 9-11-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order Dated 8-25-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons does not conform to the Complaint. The word "Inclusive" is not on the original complaint. Please contact Clerk's office with questions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons rejected in File & Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons does not conform to the complaint. "Inclusive" is not on the complaint. Plaintiff's name "Adela" does not match the complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 3rd Rejection. Summons does not conform to the Complaint. Angela Whittaker is not named as a Defendant on the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Plaintiff's name on Summons does not conform to Plaintiff's name on the complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/27/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.