This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/18/2018 at 03:28:30 (UTC).

GARCES MEMORIAL HIGH SCHOOL/DIOCESE OF FRESNO ED. CORP. VS MAGANA

Case Summary

On 10/08/2015 GARCES MEMORIAL HIGH SCHOOL/DIOCESE OF FRESNO ED CORP filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against MAGANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1181

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCES MEMORIAL HIGH SCHOOL/DIOCESE OF FRESNO ED. CORP.

Respondent

MAGANA, MARIO

Not Classified By Court

DEES, GUY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JUDY, KALEB L

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Minute Order- Case Status Conference 2/1/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/19/16; 1/21/16; Parties Present Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

Case Status Conference

Minute Order- Case Status Conference 1/21/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 1/19/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JUDY, KALEB L; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

Case Status Conference

Minute Order- Case Status Conference 1/19/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/4/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JUDY, KALEB L; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

Case Status Conference

Minute Order- Case Status Conference 1/4/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Sched. from Petition for harassment heard on 11/4/15.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JUDY, KALEB L; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

Petition for Harassment

Minute Order- Petition for Harassment 11/4/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCES MEMORIAL HIGH SCHOOL/DIOCESE OF FRESNO ED. CORP.; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: FIRM CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Petition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Cont'd from 11/04/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Status Conference - Minute Order- Case Status Conference 2/1/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/19/16; 1/21/16; Parties Present Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Status Conference - Minute Order- Case Status Conference 1/21/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 1/19/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JUDY, KALEB L; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Status Conference - Minute Order- Case Status Conference 1/19/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/4/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JUDY, KALEB L; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Status Conference - Minute Order- Case Status Conference 1/4/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Sched. from Petition for harassment heard on 11/4/15.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JUDY, KALEB L; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance - Comment: 2-10-16, 8:30, D-12 **ETIENNE**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Request to Continue Court Hearing and Reissue Temporary - Comment: Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Harassment - Minute Order- Petition for Harassment 11/4/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: GARCES MEMORIAL HIGH SCHOOL/DIOCESE OF FRESNO ED. CORP.; Respondent: MAGANA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: AS TO MARIO MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: AS TO MARIO MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Proof of Firearms Turned In or Sold - Comment: TO LICENSED GUN DEALER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 11-4-15, 8:30 AM, D-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Temporary Restraining Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED. 100 YARD STAY AWAY ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GARCES MEMORIAL HIGH SCHOOL/DIOCESE OF FRESNO ED. CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Petition Workplace Violence

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.