This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:48 (UTC).

GAMEZ VS. QUINTANA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 GAMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QUINTANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8998

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAMEZ, JOSE

Defendants

QUINTANA, BETSY

QUINTANA, JOEL

AUTREY, FREDERICK

GONZALES, KARLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

ANDREESEN, JOEL T

Attorney at RODRIGUEZ & ASSOC

2020 Eye St

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Defendant Attorneys

KRAMER, JEFFREY S

O'KELLY, WILLIAM P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • Court Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Final Case Management Conference - Original Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: FCMC 9-5-14. TRIAL 9-22-14. (D-17) T/E 5 DAYS FCMC 9-5-14. TRIAL 9-22-14. (D-17) T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DANIEL RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED 5/19/2014 ~ calid=2359433 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4000, CourtDate:09/22/2014, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CTC, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:9/23/2013 9:43:22 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED 5/19/2014 ~ calid=2359434 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4142, CourtDate:09/05/2014, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:CFM, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:9/23/2013 9:43:37 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED 5/19/2014 ~ calid=2371476 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4007, CourtDate:08/22/2014, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:8, SessionType:STL, Judge:DRL, SystemDate:10/4/2013 3:20:32 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES FILED BY JOEL T. ANDREESEN, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 8/19/2013 BY FREDERICK AUTREY & KARLYN GONZALES FILED BY WILLIAM P. O'KELLY, COUNSEL FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANTS, FREDERICK AUTREY & KARLYN GONZALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 8/16/2013 BY BETSY QUINTANA & JOEL QUINTANA FILED BY SANAZ A. SHAMSIAN, COUNSEL FOR BETSY QUINTANA; & JOEL QUINTANA

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2013
  • 4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: GAMEZ, JOSE; Defendant: QUINTANA, BETSY; Defendant: QUINTANA, JOEL; Defendant: AUTREY, FREDERICK; Defendant: GONZALES, KARLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO JOEL QUINTANA PERSONAL SERVICE 7/4/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO KARLYN GONZALES PERSONAL SERVICE 7/5/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for GAMEZ, JOSE (PL-1). Received from RODRIGUEZ & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 53473. Receipt #709621 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: (BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY JOEL T. ANDREESEN, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JOEL T. ANDREESEN, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 676

    Read MoreRead Less