Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:48:51 (UTC).

GAMBOA VS GAMBOA

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 GAMBOA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GAMBOA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S., Knight, Alisa R., Shayer, Steven, Benavides, Jose R., Turner, Jerold L., Robertson, Murray J. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0154

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Knight, Alisa R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

Turner, Jerold L.

Robertson, Murray J.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GAMBOA, JULIO

Respondent

GAMBOA, LUCINA AYON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

Respondent Attorney

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney's

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Responsive Declaration

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.; Comment: AFTER HEARING 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.; Comment: AFTER HEARING 01/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF RESPONDENT'S COMPLETION OF 12-WEEK EDUCATIONAL COPARENTING PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Supplemental Declaration to Petitioner's Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Responsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: GAMBOA, JULIO; Served: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Child Custody & Visitation, Return of the Minors Personal Belongings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWANSON, JEREMY D