Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 16:39:33 (UTC).

GALVAN VS ALVAREZ, BELTRAN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2012 GALVAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVAREZ, BELTRAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6939

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALVAN, LETICIA

Defendants

BELTRAN, RUBI

ALVAREZ, DOLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESSY, FAWN KENNEDY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2013
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Comment: SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ETIENNE SENT VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for GALVAN, LETICIA (PL-1). Received from DESSY & DESSY, check no(s) 14859. Receipt #696570 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO DOLORES ALVAREZ AND RUBI BELTRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketDeclaration in Lieu of Testimony Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: KERN ISSUED: 10/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for GALVAN, LETICIA (PL-1). Received from DESSY & DESSY, check no(s) 14663. Receipt #681865 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FILED ~ calid=2031312 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:12/06/2012, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:katherinew, SystemDate:9/14/2012 4:19:56 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketNP1843 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CONFERENCE IN CHAMBERS JUDGE GARY R WITT RECUSES HIMSELF/HERSELF. CASE ORDERED TRANSFERED TO 1415 TRUXTUN AVE CIVIL DEPARTMENT FOR FUTHER FILINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO DOLORES ALVAREZ AND RUBI BELTRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO RUBI BELTRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO DOLORES ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Dec 06, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Dec 06, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for GALVAN, LETICIA (PL-1). Received from DESSY AND DESSY, check no(s) 14619. Receipt #676487 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 606

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DESSY, FAWN KENNEDY