This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:46:03 (UTC).

GALLOWAY, ET AL VS ODLE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 GALLOWAY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ODLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0035

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALLOWAY, GAYTHEL

GALLOWAY, WAYNE

Defendant

ODLE, SAMUEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: GALLOWAY, WAYNE; GALLOWAY, GAYTHEL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 426 Shattuck Ave Taft, CA 93268; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: ODLE, SAMUEL D; Party: Names: GALLOWAY, WAYNE; GALLOWAY, GAYTHEL; ODLE, SAMUEL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Samuel D. Odle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Samuel D Odle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: GALLOWAY, WAYNE, GALLOWAY, GAYTHEL; Served: 07/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 426 SHATTUCK AVE TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via In ProPer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less