This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:02 (UTC).

GALLEN VS GALLEN

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 GALLEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GALLEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0112

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALLEN, CHRISTOPHER MONTE

Respondent

GALLEN, HEATHER JOEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less