This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:45 (UTC).

GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICES, INC., A CORPORATION VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICES, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0593

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., a corporation

GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICES, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendant

Sanchez, Marcelina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENGARTEN, RONALD D

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 09/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration rejected in File and Serve

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: re: Proof of Service pursuant to CRC rule 3.110 (Cont'd from 07/05/17) **Also has CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 09/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Ronald Rosengarten in Response to Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause re:Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration rejected in File and Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/5/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.