Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:58:57 (UTC).

FULMER VS HOLY TEMPLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 FULMER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLY TEMPLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1281

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FULMER, EVON

Defendants

HOLY TEMPLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST

PASTOR ELD DONALD RAY HARRIS

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: FULMER, EVON

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FULMER, EVON; Awarded Against: HOLY TEMPLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST; PASTOR ELD DONALD RAY HARRIS; Amount; Damages: $200.00; Costs: $165.00; Total: $365.00; Party: Names: FULMER, EVON; HOLY TEMPLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST; PASTOR ELD DONALD RAY HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Returned via pro-per bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ABSTRACT IS INCOMPLETE; RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES/ MONEY/ WES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/ MONEY/ WES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: FULMER, EVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO FRANCES HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE TO PASTOR ELD DONALD RAY HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE HOLY TEMPLE CHURCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FULMER, EVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less