This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:53:00 (UTC).

FULGENCIA CHIN CALDWELL CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 FULGENCIA CHIN CALDWELL CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn O., Knight, Alisa R., Bittleston, Dawn, Wyatt, Ralph W., Kohler, Greg J., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2208

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn O.

Knight, Alisa R.

Bittleston, Dawn

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kohler, Greg J.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

OCULAM, MARIA RIZHEL

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

KENDALL, ANDREW B

RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 03/01/19 MO, proof of transfer has not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Public Defender: RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

Petition

Petition 11/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - to change venue NOTE - 1. Notice of Hearing filed 10/03/18 and 11/07/18 to "GG" does not match petition (Gigi v. GG). Need corrected Notice of Hearing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Public Defender: RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 08/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 08/09/18, original statement of annuity and transfer petition to Los Angeles County have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Public Defender: RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 05/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Supplement filed 05/18/18 re original statements re annuity to be filed with court upon receipt.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition for Fees

Petition for Fees 02/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kohler, Greg J.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 01/10/18, Accounting has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition

Petition 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING petition to compel accounting; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition

Petition 08/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition to compel accounting; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Compliance Hearing

MO Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 7/14/16, the Notice of Conservatee's Rights, Level of Care Plan, and Proof of Deposit have not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

MO Appt of Conservator: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn O.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NEW NOTE - 1. #1a re placement on Attachment Requesting Special Orders Requesting Dementia attached to supplement is marked however #4 is not marked re restricted placement. Is petitioner requesting power of placement? Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: OCULAM, MARIA RIZHEL; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

MO 121515: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE ***SAME NOTE- 1. Need Family Court Service Report.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for appointment of conservator 090815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person and Estate ***NOTES - 1. Is Petitioner requesting dementia powers? If so, #1k on page 2 of petition is incomplete and will also need Attachment Requesting Special Orders (GC-313). 2. Need Family Court Service Report.; Parties Present Petitioner: OCULAM, MARIA RIZHEL; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

Ruling 7/16/15: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: proof of transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: Second Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketReceipt for Records Mailed - Comment: to Los Angeles Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: Los Angeles Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 03/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 03/01/19 MO, proof of transfer has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order for petition to change venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: transfer petition to Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 11/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - to change venue NOTE - 1. Notice of Hearing filed 10/03/18 and 11/07/18 to "GG" does not match petition (Gigi v. GG). Need corrected Notice of Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Investigator - Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Identification Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: Petition for appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.