This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:37:51 (UTC).

FUENTES VS FUENTES

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 FUENTES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FUENTES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FUENTES, JESSICA

Respondent

FUENTES, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Ex Parte Hearing 08/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2016
  • Cause of Action: DCSS; Type: Action; Filed By: 11388; Filed Against: 11388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: FUENTES, JESSICA; FUENTES, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: Arrangement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 08/02/2019: Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: FUENTES, JESSICA; Respondent: FUENTES, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2016
  • Cause Of Action - Action DCSS; File Date: 07/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Summons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Amended Petition - Comment: for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.