This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:59 (UTC).

F&T V. LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 F T filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3693

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY

Defendant

VERA LOPEZ, CAZZANDRA YVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Attorney at FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY

268 N Main St

Porterville, CA 93257

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Abstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 1009826. Receipt #756467 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 1007731. Receipt #744188 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 14, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 14, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: (PL) OSC RE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 13, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 13, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Statement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Affidavit - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 1001937. Receipt #709447 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 556

    Read MoreRead Less