Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 08:08:02 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS SIERRA FENCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIERRA FENCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2914

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SIERRA FENCE COMPANY

HAL HAYS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

KING, SHELBY

PERERA CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN, INC.

Cross Defendant

HAL HAYES CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC, JULIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BOGGS, JOSIAH

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Sean Dowsing, For Stipulation & Order - Per telephone conversion, Default, as to Defendant, Hal Hays Construction, Inc has not been filed with the Clerk's office. Counsel is to File Answer 4/1/2021.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/26/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Amendment to Complaint for Doe 1 Perera Construction & Design, Inc. via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Cross-Defendant, Hal Hayes Construction, Inc -ONLY - Without Prejudice - ROES remain pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Defendant, Hal Hayes Construction, Inc - ONLY - Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: re: Dismissal of Hal Hayes Construction, Inc from the Complaint and Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Cross-Complaint/Summons as to Cross-Defendant Hal Hays Construction, Inc., via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe 1 as Perera Construction & Design, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Sean Dowsing, For Stipulation & Order - Per telephone conversion, Default, as to Defendant, Hal Hays Construction, Inc has not been filed with the Clerk's office. Counsel is to File Answer 4/1/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Sierra Fence Company via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Hal Hays Construction, Inc. via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/22/20203:42 PM; Served: 12/18/202012:23 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/26/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Perera Construction Design, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HAL HAYS CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant