Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:16:28 (UTC).

FREIDA BRANSON CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 FREIDA BRANSON CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2320

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BRANSON, DAVID

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GELBER, JAMIE P

KENDALL, ANDREW B

RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of attorney

Petition for Fees

Petition for Fees 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Services for 11/13/17 in Exhibit A indicates Attorney AL performed them. Is AL the same person as AK? Need verified supplement.

Petition

Petition 03/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR ORDER WAIVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL AND ACCOUNTING AND TO DISCHARGE FIDUCIARY BOND (PC 3051)

Compliance Hearing

(2) Petition and Compliance Hearing 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 11/01/17, inventory & appraisal has not been filed. 11/20/17 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING REVISED NOTE - 1. As of 09/13/16, inventory & appraisal to be filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTERS AND BOND OUT BASKET

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Confidential supplement.

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

5/22/17 MO: Petition for Appointment of Conservator: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. #6a on Confidential Supplemental Information is incomplete re health svcs provided. Need CONFIDENTIAL verified supplement. 2. Petitioner requesting PC 2590 "q" powers re employment, however power was removed by statute. 3. Need Family Court Services Report.; Parties Present Petitioner: BRANSON, DAVID; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

Ruling 04/12/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Jamie P. Gelber New Attorney: Pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order on petition for order waiving inventory and appraisal and accounting and discharge fiduciary bond (PC Sec. 3051 et sec.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order After Hearing Public Defender Fee Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Filing - Comment: Notice of Filing Inventory and Appraisal and How to Object to the Inventory or the Appraised Value of Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ORDER MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Fees - Petition for Fees 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Services for 11/13/17 in Exhibit A indicates Attorney AL performed them. Is AL the same person as AK? Need verified supplement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: inventory and appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 03/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR ORDER WAIVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL AND ACCOUNTING AND TO DISCHARGE FIDUCIARY BOND (PC 3051)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: final $-0-

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/12/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Investigator - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketConfidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator-Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELBER, JAMIE P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENDALL, ANDREW B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RATLIFF BAIMA, CRYSTAL NICHOLE