This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 07:07:45 (UTC).

FREEWAY FUNDING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS RAGSDALE

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 FREEWAY FUNDING, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAGSDALE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5892

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEWAY FUNDING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

RAGSDALE, KEIERA DESHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH BARRY A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/29/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

12/07/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 03/27/2023Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: L; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FREEWAY FUNDING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FREEWAY FUNDING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FREEWAY FUNDING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FREEWAY FUNDING, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less