This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:19 (UTC).

FRED GOODSPEED DBA AT HOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT VS QUALLS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 FRED GOODSPEED DBA AT HOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against QUALLS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5699

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRED GOODSPEED DBA AT HOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Defendants

QUALLS, LOREN

ARBLE, STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, RONALD S

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MAILED/ DKR

Further Hearing - Post-Disposition

Further Hearing - Post-Disposition 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ***Compliance Hearing*** **$8,910.00 to be paid in the plaintiff**; Parties Present Defendant: QUALLS, LOREN

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 01/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Ex Parte application and declaration for relief from eviction; Parties Present Defendant: QUALLS, LOREN

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 12/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY LOREN QUALLS & STEPHANIE ARBLE. TIME ESTIMATE 1 HR; Parties Present Plaintiff: FRED GOODSPEED DBA AT HOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via mail

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: First apperance fee of $225.00 required for each answering party. Only one appearance fee was added through file and serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: First appearance fees of $225.00 is required for each party. Also cannot file two answers under one lead document. Unclear as to if you are trying to file separate answers for each defendant or 1 answer for both.

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition)

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) 10/30/2017: Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO STEPHANIE ARBLE CLOSED HEARING

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Answer is not properly being filed. Cannot file the whole packet with instructions and all. Must submit only the necessary documents. Proof of service does not show that plaintiff's attorney listed on complaint was served. Please seek legal advice

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MAILED/ DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment - Comment: NABIL RABADI ASSIGNED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Ronald S. Sims New Attorney: Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Post-Disposition - Further Hearing - Post-Disposition 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ***Compliance Hearing*** **$8,910.00 to be paid in the plaintiff**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 01/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Ex Parte application and declaration for relief from eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketPoints and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of exparte motion staying execution of writ pending hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Goodspeed v. Qualls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Answer is not properly being filed. Cannot file the whole packet with instructions and all. Must submit only the necessary documents. Proof of service does not show that plaintiff's attorney listed on complaint was served. Please seek legal advice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 5226 PRAIRIE WHEAT AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93313

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA NEUMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FRED GOODSPEED DBA AT HOME PROPERTY MANAGEMENT; Served: 10/10/20176:41 PM; Served: 10/10/20176:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.