This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:31:57 (UTC).

FRANKLIN PIERCE SAMPLES CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 09/15/2015 FRANKLIN PIERCE SAMPLES CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Tafoya, Robert S. and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2444

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Tafoya, Robert S.

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SAMPLES, LORA G

SAMPLES, FRANKLIN PIERCE, Jr.

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OEHLER, NANCY L

VAN SCIVER, KURT D

KENDALL, ANDREW B

 

Court Documents

Petition

Petition 01/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for confirmation of community property nature of assets and dispensing with the requirement of accountings [California Probate Code Sections 305 1(a) and (b) and 2628(b); California Family Code Section 760] NOTES: 1. Notice of Hearing filed 12/8/16 indicates Franklin Pierce Samples and Lora G. Samples were served at Rosewood Senior Living Community, 1310 New Stein Road, Apt. 705, Bakersfield, CA 93309; however, the Post-Move Notice of Change of Residence of Conservatee or Ward filed 11/29/16 indicates the address of Rosewood Senior Living Community is 1301 New Stein Road, Apt. 705, Bakersfield, CA 93309. Need supplement to verify notice is proper.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OEHLER, NANCY L; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: OEHLER, NANCY L

Petition for Fees

07/29/16 MO: Petition for Fees - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - HEARING TO BE HEARD IN DELANO SUPERIOR COURT DIVISION A.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

02/26/16 MO: Petiton to Appoint Conservator: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PENDING JTD ON THE FOLLOWING NOTES - PETITION FOR APPONTMENT OF CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE NOTES - 1. Need Capacity Declaration GC-335 (JTD). NOTE/COMMENT - 2. Bond minimum is $20,000 or deposit all funds in court blocked account (JTD).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

Ruling continuance 1/7/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

MO - Petition to Appoint Temp. Coservator: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: SAMPLES, LORA G; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

MO-Petition to Appoint Temporary Conserrvator: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: SAMPLES, LORA G; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

MO-Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator-Amended: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: SAMPLES, LORA G; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

MO - Ruling - Public Defender Appointed: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PETITIONER/RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDeath of Conservatee / Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Order - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNot Prop Disp Civil Case Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Post-Move

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: color copy drivers license

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: color copy drivers license

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: conservatees photograph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator-Person and Estate - Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OEHLER, NANCY L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN SCIVER, KURT D