This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/16/2020 at 09:48:55 (UTC).

FRANK LEE BAUMGARTNER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 FRANK LEE BAUMGARTNER DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3101

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BAUMGARTNER, RITA

NOVAK, RITA J.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Affidavit of small value; returned via envelope provided

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Affidavit of small value; no return envelope; mailed back to sender's address

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAffidavit/Small Value - Comment: Affidavit Re Real Property of Small Value; No Will dated 12/30/2008; $6,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Affidavit of small value; returned via envelope provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Affidavit of small value; no return envelope; mailed back to sender's address

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.