This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:15:52 (UTC).

FRANCO VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 FRANCO filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRANCO, MAGDALENA ATONDO

Respondent

HERNANDEZ, ARIEL

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Petition for Harassment 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: hrg: 1/22/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: No Temporary Order Issued *** No Judicial Officer Signature***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FRANCO, MAGDALENA ATONDO; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: and Stipulation re: Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.