This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 07:43:59 (UTC).

FRANCO ET AL VS FRANCO

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 FRANCO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FRANCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1252

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

FRANCO, CESAR

FRANCO, LUIS

FRANCO, ROBERT

FRANCO, JOSE

FRANCO, ENRIQUE

FRANCO, ROBERTO CARLOS

KIND BROTHERS COLLECTIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SLOCUMB WILLIAM H

PHAN ROBERT N

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint

07/20/2022: Answer to Complaint

Stipulation and Order

07/18/2022: Stipulation and Order

Notice

07/08/2022: Notice

Proof of Service

06/24/2022: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/13/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Motion

06/13/2022: Notice of Motion

Order to Show Cause

05/31/2022: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

05/31/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Case Management Conference

01/10/2023: Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

11/03/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/03/2022: Case Management Statement

Electronic Rejection Notice

10/31/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Notice of Consolidation

08/22/2022: Notice of Consolidation

Order After Hearing

08/11/2022: Order After Hearing

Motion to Consolidate

08/04/2022: Motion to Consolidate

Reply

07/26/2022: Reply

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRANCO, JOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Consolidation; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRANCO, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Case Consolidated - Parent Case; Comment: LEAD CASE BCV-22-101252, CHILD CASE BCL-22-012178

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order After Hearing; Comment: Motion to Consolidate Granted, BCL-22-012178 to be the child case and BCV-22-101252 to be the lead case; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Consolidate; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Defendant's Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRANCO, JOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: to Continue Hearing Date of Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRANCO, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: of Stipulation to Continue Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate; Declaration of Robert N. Phan; Attached Exhibits; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRANCO, JOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: POS on Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate Civil Action with Unlawful Detainer Action; Points and Authorities and Declaration of William H Slocumb; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Jose Franco, via personal service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: Notice of Motin and Motion to Consolidate Civil Action With Unlawful Detainer Action, Points and Authorities and Declaration of William H Slocumb; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRANCO, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/13/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, CESAR|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, LUIS|PLAINTIFF - FRANCO, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOCUMB WILLIAM H