This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:23 (UTC).

FOX HEAD, INC., VS XTREME FASHION INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 FOX HEAD, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against XTREME FASHION INC . This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5751

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOX HEAD, INC.,

Defendants

LARA, JOSE

XTREME FASHION INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA, RUDOLFO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FOX HEAD, INC.,; Awarded Against: XTREME FASHION INC.,; LARA, JOSE; Amount; Damages: $17,394.77; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,027.25; Attorney Fees: $2,739.48; Costs: $528.00; Total: $22689.50; Party: Names: FOX HEAD, INC.,; XTREME FASHION INC.,; LARA, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: DKR/MESSENGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Xtreme Fashion Inc.; and Jose Lara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: In Lieu of testimony in suport of Request for entry of default Judgment, Pursuant to CCP Section 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Of Rudy Gaba, Jr. in support of Calculation of Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Xtreme Fashion, Inc. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less