This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 17:58:26 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS SKAGGS

Case Summary

On 01/20/2015 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SKAGGS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Errea, Larry A., Camacho, Marcos R., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9285

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Errea, Larry A.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

SKAGGS, GINGER B

SKAGGS, RICHARD L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL, TODD

Attorney at MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES

3636 Birch St #290

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2016
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Docket4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; Judgment Amount: $10,985.25; And Attorney Fees: $921.32; Awarded Against: SKAGGS, GINGER B; SKAGGS, RICHARD L; Amount; Damages: $9,213.22; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 9.49 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $451.71; Attorney Fees: $921.32; Costs: $399.00; Total: $10985.25; Party: Names: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; SKAGGS, GINGER B; SKAGGS, RICHARD L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT [C.C.P. 585 (D), 1033]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: FOR USE OF IMAGED CONTRACT AND DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS (E.C. 1521, 1553) (C.R.C. 3.1806)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES OR IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO GINGER B SKAGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO RICHARD L SKAGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 08, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 08, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 17, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 17, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC (PL-1). Received from MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LTD, check no(s) 60408. Receipt #819608 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.