This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:19 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS PATTERSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATTERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5949

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

PATTERSON, JASON E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL, TODD

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less