This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:58 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS KING

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1797

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

KING, DONALD R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL, TODD

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $15 to MacDowelll & Associates. Completed on 01/17/20. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Cont'd from 03/13/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; Awarded Against: KING, DONALD R; Amount; Damages: $13,686.95; Pre-Judgment Interest: $781.10; Attorney Fees: $1,368.70; Costs: $491.00; Total: $16327.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to DONALD R KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: accepting image reproduction or copies as originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: FOR USE OF IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to DONALD R KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO DONALD R KING , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less