This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:17 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS JOHNSTON

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHNSTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5745

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

JOHNSTON, JAMES W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL, TODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; Awarded Against: JOHNSTON, JAMES W; Amount; Damages: $10,527.73; Pre-Judgment Interest: $579.75; Attorney Fees: $1,052.77; Costs: $437.00; Total: $12597.25; Party: Names: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC; JOHNSTON, JAMES W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO JAMES W JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Declaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: A PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D), AND 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO JAMES W JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to James W. Johnston. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less